Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugenio Raffaele Faggiano, C.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cariati, Italy

Titular Bishop of Musti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1877Born
31 May 190326.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Passion
15 Feb 193659.0AppointedBishop of Cariati, Italy
19 Apr 193659.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cariati, Italy
25 Sep 195679.6RetiredBishop of Cariati, Italy
25 Sep 195679.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Musti
2 May 196083.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Cariati, Italy

MicroData Summary for Eugenio Raffaele Faggiano
Bishop Eugenio Raffaele Faggiano C.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cariati

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalice Salentino

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,578
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018