Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giuseppe Cardinal Francica-Nava de Bontifè

Deceased

Archbishop of Catania, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1846Born
22 May 186922.8Ordained PriestPriest of Catania, Italy
9 Aug 188337.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Caltanissetta, Italy
9 Aug 188337.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Alabanda
21 Oct 188337.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alabanda
4 May 188942.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
24 May 188942.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
18 Mar 189548.6AppointedArchbishop of Catania, Italy
25 Jul 189650.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
19 Jun 189952.9Elevated to Cardinal
14 Dec 189953.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
7 Dec 192882.3DiedArchbishop of Catania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Francica-Nava de Bontifè (VIAF: 88788282)
Giuseppe Cardinal Francica-Nava de Bontifè (born , died ) Archbishop of Catania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCatania, Archdiocese of Catania
Ordained BishopS. Michele Arcangelo, Cathedral, Caltanissetta, Diocese of Caltanissetta
Death PlaceCatania, Archdiocese of Catania
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Catania, Archdiocese of Catania

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 45.1 years
  • a cardinal for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 83, and Page 192
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 302, and Page 48
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jun 1899
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 55
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 64, and Page 65, and Page 239
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 240

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast