Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Iacono

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Caltanissetta

Titular Archbishop of Mocissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1873BornRagusa
20 Sep 190229.5Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jul 191845.3AppointedBishop of Molfetta-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy
8 Sep 191845.5Ordained BishopBishop of Molfetta-Giovinazzo-Terlizzi, Italy
18 Mar 192148.0AppointedBishop of Caltanissetta, Italy
21 Aug 195683.4RetiredBishop of Caltanissetta, Italy
21 Aug 195683.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Mocissus
26 May 195784.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Caltanissetta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Iacono:
Archbishop Giovanni Iacono (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Caltanissetta

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 38.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 40
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 103

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013