Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edgardo Cedeño Muñoz, S.V.D.

Bishop of Penonomé, Panama


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1960 Born
19 Mar 198828.1Perpetual VowsMember of Society of the Divine Word
28 Oct 198929.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
15 Oct 201555.7AppointedBishop of Penonomé, Panama
5 Dec 201555.8Ordained BishopBishop of Penonomé, Panama

MicroData Summary for Edgardo Cedeño Muñoz
Bishop Edgardo Cedeño Muñoz S.V.D. (born ) Bishop of Penonomé

EventPlace
Birth PlacePanamá

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Penonomé.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Oct 2015
  • ob: CB, 15 Oct 2015
  • c2: CB, 16 Oct 2015
  • c34: CB, 3 Dec 2015
  • c1: CB, 5 Dec 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,681

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018