Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Dimas Cedeño Delgado

Archbishop Emeritus of Panamá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1933 BornPeña Blanca
25 Jun 196127.9Ordained PriestPriest
15 Feb 197541.5AppointedBishop of Santiago de Veraguas, Panama
17 May 197541.8Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Veraguas, Panama
18 Apr 199460.7AppointedArchbishop of Panamá
18 Feb 201076.5RetiredArchbishop of Panamá
25 Jun 201581.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Penonomé, Panama
5 Dec 201582.3CeasedApostolic Administrator of Penonomé, Panama

MicroData Summary for José Dimas Cedeño Delgado
Archbishop José Dimas Cedeño Delgado (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Panamá

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Panamá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2010
  • ab: CB, 25 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 2 May 2016