Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Ochogavía Barahona, O.S.A.

Bishop of Colón-Kuna Yala, Panama


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1967 Born
8 Sep 199023.1ProfessedMember of Order of St. Augustine
11 Aug 199528.0Solemn VowsMember of Order of St. Augustine
4 May 200234.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
7 Jul 201446.9AppointedBishop of Colón-Kuna Yala, Panama
27 Sep 201447.1Ordained BishopBishop of Colón-Kuna Yala, Panama

MicroData Summary for Manuel Ochogavía Barahona
Bishop Manuel Ochogavía Barahona O.S.A. (born ) Bishop of Colón-Kuna Yala

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLas Tablas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Colón-Kuna Yala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jul 2014
  • ob: CB, 8 Jul 2014
  • c2+: CB, 18 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,288

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast