Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dominikus Saku

Bishop of Atambua, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1960 Born
29 Sep 199232.4Ordained PriestPriest of Atambua, Indonesia
2 Jun 200747.1AppointedBishop of Atambua, Indonesia
21 Sep 200747.4Ordained BishopBishop of Atambua, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Dominikus Saku
Bishop Dominikus Saku (born ) Bishop of Atambua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTaikas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Atambua.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 2 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,513

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast