Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gregorius Manteiro, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Kupang


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1924BornLarantuka
24 Oct 195127.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
13 Apr 196743.0AppointedBishop of Kupang, Indonesia
15 Aug 196743.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kupang, Indonesia
23 Oct 198965.6AppointedArchbishop of Kupang, Indonesia
10 Oct 199773.5DiedArchbishop of Kupang, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Gregorius Manteiro:
Archbishop Gregorius Manteiro S.V.D. (born , died ) Archbishop of Kupang

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015