Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Ricardo da Silva

Bishop of Díli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1943 BornAileu
15 Aug 197229.3Ordained PriestPriest of Díli, Timor-Leste
27 Feb 200460.8AppointedBishop of Díli, Timor-Leste
2 May 200461.0Ordained BishopBishop of Díli, Timor-Leste

MicroData Summary for Alberto Ricardo da Silva:
Bishop Alberto Ricardo da Silva (born ) Bishop of Díli

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Díli.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,583

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013