Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sanctus Lino Wanok

Bishop of Lira, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1957 Born
31 Aug 198629.3Ordained DeaconDeacon of Arua, Uganda
27 Sep 198629.4Ordained PriestPriest of Arua, Uganda
23 Feb 199638.8IncardinatedPriest of Nebbi, Uganda
8 Feb 201153.8AppointedBishop of Nebbi, Uganda
30 Apr 201154.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nebbi, Uganda
23 Nov 201861.6AppointedBishop of Lira, Uganda
9 Feb 201961.8InstalledBishop of Lira, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Sanctus Lino Wanok (VIAF: 311412355)
Bishop Sanctus Lino Wanok (born ) Bishop of Lira

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAtyak-Yamo
Ordained BishopImmaculate Heart of Mary, Cathedral, Nebbi, Diocese of Nebbi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lira.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 10 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,047
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2018
  • od/c01/i: CB, 9 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 11 Feb 2019

Quantcast