Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Albino Mensa

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Vercelli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1916Born
29 Jun 193923.4Ordained PriestPriest
28 Mar 196044.2AppointedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
22 May 196044.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ivrea, Italy
5 Jun 196044.3InstalledBishop of Ivrea, Italy
12 Oct 196650.7AppointedArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy
4 Jun 199175.3RetiredArchbishop of Vercelli, Italy
8 Jan 199881.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Vercelli, Italy

MicroData Summary
Albino Mensa
Archbishop Albino Mensa
(born , died )
Archbishop Emeritus of Vercelli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilla Alicia, Diocese of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
Ordained BishopPinerola, Diocese of Pinerolo
Death PlacePinerola, Diocese of Pinerolo

  • a priest for 58.5 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1960, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025