Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Agostino Cardinal Richelmy

Deceased

Archbishop of Torino {Turin}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1850BornTorino
25 Apr 187322.4Ordained PriestPriest of Torino {Turin}, Italy
7 Jun 188635.5AppointedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
28 Oct 188635.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ivrea, Italy
18 Sep 189746.8AppointedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
19 Jun 189948.6Elevated to Cardinal
22 Jun 189948.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
27 Nov 191161.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
10 Aug 192372.7DiedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Agostino Richelmy:
Cardinal Agostino Richelmy (born , died ) Archbishop of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.8 years
  • a cardinal for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 324, and Page 538
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 48, and Page 51
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jun 1899

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013