Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Tighe

Secretary of the Pontifical Council for Culture

Titular Bishop of Drivastum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1958 Born
10 Jul 198325.4Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
30 Nov 200749.7AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Social Communications
19 Dec 201557.8AppointedOfficial of the Pontifical Council for Culture
19 Dec 201557.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Drivastum
27 Feb 201658.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Drivastum
28 Oct 201759.7AppointedSecretary of the Pontifical Council for Culture

MicroData Summary for Paul Tighe (VIAF: 315523373)
Bishop Paul Tighe (born ) Secretary of Culture

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNavan, County Meath, Ireland
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Pontifical Council for Culture.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Dec 2015
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,850
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 28 Oct 2017