Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
Pontifical Commission for Educational and Religious Films | |||
17 September 1948 | Established | Pontifical Commission for Educational and Religious Films | |
Pontifical Commission for Social Communications | |||
2 April 1964 | Name Changed | Pontifical Commission for Educational and Religious Films | Pontifical Commission for Social Communications |
Pontifical Council for Social Communications | |||
28 June 1988 | Elevated | Pontifical Commission for Social Communications | Pontifical Council for Social Communications |
March 2016 | Suppressed | Pontifical Council for Social Communications (suppressed) |
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024 |
✠