Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raúl Bautista Dáel

Bishop of Tandag, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1966 Born
7 Jun 199326.6Ordained PriestPriest of Cagayan de Oro, Philippines
26 Feb 201851.3AppointedBishop of Tandag, Philippines
7 Jun 201851.6Ordained BishopBishop of Tandag, Philippines
14 Jun 201851.6InstalledBishop of Tandag, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Raúl Bautista Dáel
Bishop Raúl Bautista Dáel (born ) Bishop of Tandag

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJasa-an, Misamis Oriental, Archdiocese of Cagayan de Oro
Ordained BishopSt. Augustine, Cathedral, Cagayan de Oro, Archdiocese of Cagayan de Oro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tandag.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Feb 2018
  • mn: CB, 27 Feb 2018
  • ob/i: CB, 9 Mar 2018
  • c2+: CB, 31 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 8 Jun 2018

Quantcast