Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor de la Cruz Ocampo

Bishop of Gumaca, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1952 Born
5 Nov 197725.6Ordained PriestPriest of Balanga, Philippines
12 Jun 201563.2AppointedBishop of Gumaca, Philippines
29 Aug 201563.4Ordained BishopBishop of Gumaca, Philippines
3 Sep 201563.4InstalledBishop of Gumaca, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Victor de la Cruz Ocampo
Bishop Victor de la Cruz Ocampo (born ) Bishop of Gumaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAngles City

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gumaca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Jun 2015
  • ob: CB, 13 Jun 2015
  • mn: CB, 21 Jun 2015
  • i: CB, 5 Jul 2015
  • c2+: CB, 29 Aug 2015
  • i: CB, 12 Sep 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 224, Number 18,564

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast