Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Dulay Arigo

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Puerto Princesa, Philippines

Titular Bishop of Mactaris


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Nov 1938 Born
22 Dec 196325.1Ordained PriestPriest
23 Feb 199657.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Palawan, Philippines
23 Feb 199657.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Mactaris
18 May 199657.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mactaris
28 Oct 201677.9RetiredVicar Apostolic of Puerto Princesa, Philippines

MicroData Summary
Pedro Dulay Arigo
Bishop Pedro Dulay Arigo
(born )
Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Puerto Princesa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMalate

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Puerto Princesa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146, Number 12,752
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • mn: CB, 23 Jul 2015
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025