Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Joseph Shaheen

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Our Lady of Lebanon of Los Angeles (Maronite), California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1937Born
2 May 196426.9Ordained PriestPriest
5 Dec 200063.5AppointedBishop of Our Lady of Lebanon of Los Angeles (Maronite), California, USA
15 Feb 200163.6Ordained BishopBishop of Our Lady of Lebanon of Los Angeles (Maronite), California, USA
10 Jul 201376.1RetiredBishop of Our Lady of Lebanon of Los Angeles (Maronite), California, USA
9 Aug 201780.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Our Lady of Lebanon of Los Angeles (Maronite), California, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Joseph Shaheen
Bishop Robert Joseph Shaheen (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Our Lady of Lebanon of Los Angeles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDanbury
Ordained BishopSaint Louis, Cathedral Basilica, St. Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri
Death PlaceSt. Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,906
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Jul 2013
  • c1: CB, 20 Jun 2015
  • d: CB, 10 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Aug 2017