Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Edward Kurtz

Archbishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA

Apostolic Administrator of Memphis, Tennessee


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1946 Born
18 Mar 197225.5Ordained PriestPriest of Allentown, Pennsylvania, USA
26 Oct 199953.1AppointedBishop of Knoxville, Tennessee, USA
8 Dec 199953.3Ordained BishopBishop of Knoxville, Tennessee, USA
12 Jun 200760.8AppointedArchbishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
15 Aug 200760.9InstalledArchbishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
24 Oct 201872.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Memphis, Tennessee, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Edward Kurtz
Archbishop Joseph Edward Kurtz (born ) Archbishop of Louisville

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShenandoah
Ordained BishopHoliday Inn Convention Center, Knoxville, Diocese of Knoxville, Tennessee

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Louisville.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Jun 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,654
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 24 Oct 2018

Quantcast