Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Kapp

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Fulda, Germany

Titular Bishop of Melzi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1929Born
3 Apr 195424.8Ordained PriestPriest of Fulda, Germany
8 Jul 197647.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fulda, Germany
8 Jul 197647.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Melzi
12 Sep 197647.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Melzi
13 Jul 200475.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Fulda, Germany
22 Sep 201889.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Fulda, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Kapp
Bishop Johannes Kapp (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Fulda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBurguffeln
Death PlaceKassel

  • a priest for 64.4 years
  • a bishop for 42.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d/c1: CB, 23 Sep 2018
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast