Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco Javier Luna-Pizarro y Pacheco de Chávez

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1780BornArequipa
29 Jun 180625.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
6 Jul 180625.7Ordained PriestPriest
1 Feb 183655.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lima, Peru
1 Feb 183655.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Alalis
21 Sep 183756.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alalis
24 Apr 184564.5AppointedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
9 Feb 185574.3DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Luna-Pizarro y Pacheco de Chávez:
Archbishop Francisco Javier Luna-Pizarro y Pacheco de Chávez (born , died ) Archbishop of Lima

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 63, and Page 239
  • c01: LB, 26 Jan 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013