Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Diego Antonio de Parada

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1698BornHuete, Spain
18 Dec 175254.6AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
1753²54.6Ordained BishopBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
25 Jan 176263.7AppointedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
23 Apr 177980.9DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego Antonio de Parada:
Archbishop Diego Antonio de Parada (born , died ) Archbishop of Lima

  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,000
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 71, Number 344

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 2 Feb 2015