Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mariano Fernández de Córdoba

Deceased

Bishop of La Paz, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1804Born
20 Apr 182824.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of La Paz, Bolivia
27 Apr 182824.3Ordained PriestPriest of La Paz, Bolivia
10 Apr 185147.2AppointedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
24 Aug 185147.6Ordained BishopBishop of La Paz, Bolivia
2 May 186864.3DiedBishop of La Paz, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Mariano Fernández de Córdoba
Bishop Mariano Fernández de Córdoba (born , died ) Bishop of La Paz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Paz

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 433
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast