Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jorge Benavente Macoaga

Deceased

Archbishop of Lima, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1784Born
2 Apr 180823.9Ordained PriestPriest
14 Aug 183349.3SelectedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
23 Jun 183450.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Lima, Peru
28 Aug 183551.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lima, Peru
10 Mar 183954.8DiedArchbishop of Lima, Peru

MicroData Summary for Jorge Benavente Macoaga
Archbishop Jorge Benavente Macoaga (born , died ) Archbishop of Lima

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAyata

  • a priest for 30.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: LC
  • b: LB, 2011
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 239
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,835, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast