Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Bonifacio

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Famagusta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1630Born
23 Sep 165626.3Ordained PriestPriest
19 Feb 167443.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Famagusta
24 Feb 167443.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Famagusta
14 Jul 170676.1ResignedTitular Bishop of Famagusta

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Bonifacio
Bishop Vincenzo Bonifacio (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Famagusta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRovigo

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 198
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,674, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast