Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Fabio Guinigi

Deceased

Archbishop of Ravenna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1628BornLucca
19 Feb 167446.1AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
24 Feb 167446.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
28 Aug 169163.7DiedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Fabio Guinigi:
Archbishop Fabio Guinigi (died ) Archbishop of Ravenna

  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 329

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013