Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giambattista Cardinal Patrizi

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1658BornRoma
29 Jan 170243.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
2 Feb 170243.1Ordained PriestPriest
6 Feb 170243.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
18 Feb 170243.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
13 Dec 170243.9AppointedAdministrator of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
1703¹44.0ResignedAdministrator of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
16 Dec 171556.9Elevated to Cardinal
5 Feb 171657.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
31 Jul 172768.6DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giambattista Patrizi:
Giambattista Cardinal Patrizi (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati

  • a priest for 25.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
  • a cardinal for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1715
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 34
  • ob/c2: AT, 23 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 7 Jul 2015