Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Picarelli

Deceased

Bishop of Narni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1631Born
10 Mar 167443.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Mar 167443.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 May 169059.2AppointedBishop of Narni, Italy
4 Jun 169059.2Ordained BishopBishop of Narni, Italy
Dec 1708³77.7DiedBishop of Narni, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Picarelli
Bishop Francesco Picarelli (born , died Dec 1708) Bishop of Narni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSarnano

  • a priest for 34.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 280
  • c34: CB, 21 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast