Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco de Rama, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1649¹BornAlcala de Henares
13 Feb 169041.1SelectedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
22 May 169041.3ConfirmedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
4 Jun 169041.4Ordained BishopBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
4 Aug 170960.5DiedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marco de Rama:
Bishop Marco de Rama O.S.A. (born 1649, died ) Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone)

  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 174
  • c34: CB, 21 Jul 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 26 Apr 2015