Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giorgio Parchich

Deceased

Bishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1658³Born
8 May 169032.0AppointedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
4 Jun 169032.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
Feb 1703³44.7DiedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Parchich
Bishop Giorgio Parchich (born , died Feb 1703) Bishop of Nona (Nin)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSibenik

  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 292
  • c34: CB, 21 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast