Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Michelangelo Mattei

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1628Born
7 Nov 168961.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto
13 Nov 168961.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hadrianopolis in Haemimonto
18 May 169365.0AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
22 Dec 169971.6DiedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

MicroData Summary for Michelangelo Mattei
Patriarch Michelangelo Mattei (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 69, and Page 89
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1689, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast