Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lorenzo Maria Cardinal Fieschi (de Flisco)

Deceased

Archbishop of Genova

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1642BornGenoa
10 Jul 169048.1AppointedArchbishop of Avignon, France
24 Sep 169048.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Avignon, France
18 May 170562.9AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
17 May 170663.9Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 170664.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
1 May 172683.9DiedArchbishop of Genova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Maria Fieschi (de Flisco):
Lorenzo Maria Cardinal Fieschi (de Flisco) (born , died ) Archbishop of Genova

  • a bishop for 35.6 years
  • a cardinal for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1706
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1690, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 May 2015