Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Giacomo Cardinal Cavallerini

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1639BornRoma, Italy
25 Mar 169253.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
30 Mar 169253.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 169253.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
30 Jun 169253.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
30 Jun 169253.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
12 Dec 169556.8Elevated to Cardinal
15 Apr 169657.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
21 May 169657.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola
18 Feb 169960.0DiedCardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Giacomo Cavallerini (VIAF: 80874917)
Giovanni Giacomo Cardinal Cavallerini (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Bartolomeo all’Isola

  • a priest for 6.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
  • a cardinal for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1695
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 17
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 238

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Nov 2016