Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Muzio Gaeta (Sr.)

Deceased

Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)

Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1663¹BornNapoli
19 May 168926.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 May 168926.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 169835.2AppointedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
13 Apr 169835.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
14 May 170845.3AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
7 Mar 1728³65.1DiedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Muzio Gaeta (Sr.):
Patriarch Muzio Gaeta (Sr.) (born 1663, died ) Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)

  • a priest for 38.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 114, and Page 220
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1698, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 May 2015