Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Carlo Antonelli

Deceased

Bishop of Ferentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1612¹BornVelletri
29 Jul 163523.5Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jan 167765.0AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
24 Jan 167765.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ferentino, Italy
20 Apr 169482.3DiedBishop of Ferentino, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Carlo Antonelli:
Bishop Giovanni Carlo Antonelli (born 1612, died ) Bishop of Ferentino

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 199
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1677, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 14 Apr 2015