Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Lambert

Deceased

Bishop of Ivrea, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1632Born
25 Jun 169260.2AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
30 Jun 169260.2Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
24 Nov 169866.6AppointedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
28 Sep 170674.4DiedBishop of Ivrea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Lambert
Bishop Alessandro Lambert (born , died ) Bishop of Ivrea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChambery

  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 104, and Page 229
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast