Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerolamo Ubertino Provana, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1658¹Born
1674¹16.0ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
25 Jun 169234.4AppointedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
30 Jun 169234.4Ordained BishopBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
16 Aug 169638.6DiedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerolamo Ubertino Provana
Bishop Gerolamo Ubertino Provana C.R. (born 1658, died ) Bishop of Alba (Pompea)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNizza Marittima

  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 74
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast