Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Tommaso Cardinal Ruffo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Ferrara

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1663BornNapoli
7 Apr 169834.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
13 Apr 169834.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
10 May 169834.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
Mar 1700³36.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Florence (Tuscany), Italy
17 May 170642.6Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 170642.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
29 Jan 170945.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
10 May 171753.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Ferrara, Italy
1 Jul 172662.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
26 Apr 173874.6ResignedArchbishop of Ferrara, Italy
3 Sep 173874.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
20 Aug 174076.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Damaso
29 Aug 174076.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
16 Feb 175389.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Ferrara, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Ruffo (VIAF: 37725418)
Tommaso Cardinal Ruffo (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Ferrara

  • a bishop for 54.8 years
  • a cardinal for 46.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1706
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1698, Number 7
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 259

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Nov 2016