Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Dionisio Tibiletti

Deceased

Bishop of San Luis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1887BornConcepción, Uruguay
3 Jul 191022.7Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jan 192941.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Corrientes, Argentina
25 Jan 192941.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Euroea in Epiro
23 Jun 192941.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Euroea in Epiro
13 Sep 193446.9AppointedBishop of San Luis, Argentina
24 Feb 193547.4InstalledBishop of San Luis, Argentina
14 May 194557.6DiedBishop of San Luis, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Pedro Dionisio Tibiletti:
Bishop Pedro Dionisio Tibiletti (born , died ) Bishop of San Luis

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013