Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Walter Vervoort, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pilcomayo, Paraguay

Titular Bishop of Barica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1899Born
4 Jul 192627.0Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
27 Feb 193232.6AppointedPrefect of Pilcomayo, Paraguay
15 Jul 195051.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Barica
15 Jul 195051.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Pilcomayo, Paraguay
10 Sep 195051.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Barica
24 Aug 196263.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Pilcomayo, Paraguay
12 Jul 197980.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pilcomayo, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Karl Walter Vervoort
Bishop Karl Walter Vervoort O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pilcomayo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEssen, Germany

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018