Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henrique Soares da Costa

Deceased

Bishop of Palmares, Pernambuco, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1963Born
15 Aug 199229.3Ordained PriestPriest of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil
1 Apr 200945.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Aracajú, Sergipe, Brazil
1 Apr 200945.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Acufida
19 Jun 200946.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acufida
19 Mar 201450.9AppointedBishop of Palmares, Pernambuco, Brazil
18 Jul 202057.2DiedBishop of Palmares, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Henrique Soares da Costa
Bishop Henrique Soares da Costa (born , died ) Bishop of Palmares

EventPlace
Birth PlacePenedo
Ordained BishopGinásio Presidente Fernando Collor, Maceió, Archdiocese of Maceió, Alagoas
Death PlaceMemorial São José, Hospital, Recife
Buried Place (Original)Nossa Senhora da Conceição dos Montes, Cathedral, Palmares, Diocese of Palmares, Pernambuco

  • a priest for 27.9 years
  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Apr 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,191
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2014
  • d: CB, 18 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 20 Jul 2020

Quantcast