Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Francisco Falcão de Barros

Auxiliary Bishop of Brazil, Military

Titular Bishop of Augurus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1965 BornPaulo Jacinto
18 Nov 199126.7Ordained PriestPriest of Palmeira dos Índios, Alagoas, Brazil
16 Feb 201145.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brazil, Military
16 Feb 201145.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Augurus
29 Apr 201146.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augurus

MicroData Summary for José Francisco Falcão de Barros:
Bishop José Francisco Falcão de Barros (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Brazil, Military

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of Brazil, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Feb 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,042

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013