Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antônio Muniz Fernandes, O. Carm.

Archbishop of Maceió, Alagoas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1952 BornPrincesa Isabel
20 Feb 197623.5ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
24 May 198027.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
4 Feb 199845.5AppointedBishop of Guarabira, Paraiba, Brazil
24 May 199845.8Ordained BishopBishop of Guarabira, Paraiba, Brazil
22 Nov 200654.3AppointedArchbishop of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil
4 Feb 200754.5InstalledArchbishop of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Muniz Fernandes:
Archbishop Antônio Muniz Fernandes O. Carm. (born ) Archbishop of Maceió

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Maceió.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Nov 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,326

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 Mar 2014