Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Golser

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1943Born
10 Oct 196825.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}, Italy
5 Dec 200865.5AppointedBishop of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}, Italy
8 Mar 200965.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}, Italy
27 Jul 201168.1ResignedBishop of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}, Italy
25 Dec 201673.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Karl Golser (VIAF: 268056624)
Bishop Karl Golser (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bolzano-Bressanone {Bozen-Brixen}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTscherms-Cermes

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Dec 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,062
  • d: CB, 25 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jan 2017