Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adelmo Tacconi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Grosseto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1915BornRoccastrada
3 Feb 194024.2Ordained PriestPriest of Grosseto, Italy
23 Apr 197054.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
23 Apr 197054.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinna
21 Jun 197054.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinna
197559.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Grosseto, Italy
23 Mar 197963.3AppointedBishop of Grosseto, Italy
20 Jul 199175.7RetiredBishop of Grosseto, Italy
16 Sep 200387.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Grosseto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Adelmo Tacconi:
Bishop Adelmo Tacconi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Grosseto

  • a priest for 63.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013