Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Martinelli, O.F.M. Cap.

Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}

Titular Bishop of Musti in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1958 BornMilano
8 Sep 198021.9ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
23 Dec 198426.2Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
7 Sep 198526.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
24 May 201455.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
24 May 201455.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Musti in Numidia
28 Jun 201455.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Musti in Numidia

MicroData Summary for Paolo Martinelli:
Bishop Paolo Martinelli O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 May 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 24 May 2014
  • c34: CB, 28 Jun 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 29 Jun 2014