Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Beniamino Pizziol

Bishop of Vicenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1947 BornCa’ Vio-Treporti
3 Dec 197225.4Ordained PriestPriest of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
5 Jan 200860.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
5 Jan 200860.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Aemona
24 Feb 200860.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aemona
16 Apr 201163.8AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
19 Jun 201164.0InstalledBishop of Vicenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Beniamino Pizziol
Bishop Beniamino Pizziol (born ) Bishop of Vicenza

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Vicenza.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2011
  • i: CB, 29 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,681

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 20 Feb 2016