Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ján Vályi

Deceased

Bishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1837Born
22 Oct 186528.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
26 Oct 186528.0Ordained PriestPriest of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
15 Mar 188345.4AppointedBishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
20 May 188345.6Ordained BishopBishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia
19 Nov 191174.1DiedBishop of Prešov (Prjašev) (Slovakian), Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Ján Vályi
Bishop Ján Vályi (born , died ) Bishop of Prešov (Prjašev)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOvéncselö, Eparchy of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
Ordained BishopCathedral, Uzhorod

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 260
  • ob/c0+: CB, 5 Jun 2015
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,467
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017