Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juraj Schopper

Deceased

Bishop of Rožňava


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1818BornBudapest
28 Mar 184224.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Mar 184224.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jan 187253.8SelectedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
6 May 187254.1ConfirmedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
25 Jul 187254.3Ordained BishopBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia
10 Apr 189577.0DiedBishop of Rožňava, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Juraj Schopper:
Bishop Juraj Schopper (born , died ) Bishop of Rožňava

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 485

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 Jun 2015