Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Žigmund Bubics

Deceased

Bishop of Košice, Slovakia

Note/Previous Titular See: Novia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1821Born
22 Jul 184423.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 May 188766.2SelectedBishop of Košice, Slovakia
16 Sep 188766.4ConfirmedBishop of Košice, Slovakia
20 Nov 188766.6Ordained BishopBishop of Košice, Slovakia
22 May 190786.1DiedBishop of Košice, Slovakia

MicroData Summary for Žigmund Bubics (VIAF: 30638708)
Bishop Žigmund Bubics (born , died ) Bishop of Košice

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOzora, Diocese of Pécs, Hungary
Ordained BishopNagyvárad, Diocese of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 189
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017